Bau, Alan Lu-Lon (CPSO#: 73792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Imaging Associates
2300 Eglinton Avenue west
Suite G02
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: 8882269989
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bau ( CPSO# 73792 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4153

Business Address:
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-0653

Business Address:
Milton Diagnostic Services
480 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9A9
Phone Number: (905) 878-8831

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 The Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
8 Browside Avenue
Toronto ON  M5P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 482-8088

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN LU-LON BAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1999