Baxter, John William Morris (CPSO#: 30947)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Avenue Medical Centre 221 Brant Avenue Brantford, ON N3T 3J2
Date Received: 03 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013