Baxter, Nancy Noel (CPSO#: 62444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
16th Floor Room 040
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5168
Fax: (416) 360-0637
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Baxter ( CPSO# 62444 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
16CC - 040
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5168

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY NOEL BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992