Bayley, Nicholas Geoffrey (CPSO#: 93412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0623
Fax: (519) 603-0625
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas G. Bayley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bayley ( CPSO# 93412 )

Business Address:
675 Queen Street South
Suite 115
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS GEOFFREY BAYLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015