Beanlands, Rob Stewart Buzzicott (CPSO#: 52966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
University of Ottawa Heart Insitute
40 Ruskin Street, Room 3409
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7334
Fax: (613) 696-7247
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rob S.B. Beanlands Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moineau ( CPSO# 54089 )
Dr. R. Beanlands ( CPSO# 52966 )

Business Address:
Cardiac PET Centre
Division of Cardiology
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5296

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROB STEWART BUZZICOTT BEANLANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEANLANDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988