Beaton, Melanie Dawn (CPSO#: 74849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Rm A10-223
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3344
Fax: (519) 663-3220
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaton Coome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Coome ( CPSO# 76415 )
Dr. M. Beaton ( CPSO# 74849 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Univeristy Hospital
A10-223 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3344

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenors Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN BEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004