Beattie, David Allan (CPSO#: 84032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Home Street
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone: (613) 423-1111
Fax: (613) 423-1112
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Beattie ( CPSO# 84032 )

Business Address:
5 Home Street
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone Number: (613) 423-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 12 Feb 2006 to 06 Apr 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Feb 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008