Beaudry, Philippe Richard (CPSO#: 59118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
720 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 4E2
Phone: (905) 333-3300
Fax: (905) 333-9793
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe R. Beaudry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Beaudry ( CPSO# 59118 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
720 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 4E2
Phone Number: (905) 333-3300

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE RICHARD BEAUDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987