Beaule, Paul-Edgar (CPSO#: 65115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
C C W 1640
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73265
Fax: 613-737-8837
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Surgicentre
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Canada
Phone: (613) 837-4207
Fax: (613) 837-6185
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Montfort Hospital
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul E. Beaule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Beaule ( CPSO# 65115 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
C C W 1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Argyle Associates
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 837-4207

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL-EDGAR BEAULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAULE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993