Beber, Brett Ashley (CPSO#: 73936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S3C3
Phone: (416) 466-5023
Fax: (416) 466-0947
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2008


Corporation Name: Dr. Beber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Beber ( CPSO# 73936 )

Business Address:
40 Holly Street
Suite 203
Toronto ON  M4C 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 466-5023

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRETT ASHLEY BEBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2004