Beck, William John (CPSO#: 31535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arbour Heights
564 Tanner Drive
Kingston ON  K7M 4X6
Phone: (613) 544-1155
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Beck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Beck ( CPSO# 31535 )

Business Address:
Arbour Heights
564 Tanner Drive
Kingston ON  K7M 0C3
Phone Number: (613) 453-1687

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN BECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1980