Becker, Edna Jean (CPSO#: 21666)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edna Becker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All requests for medical records should be directed to the hospitals at which the patient was treated.
Date Received: 03 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014