Becker, Lisa Michelle (CPSO#: 72197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-7878 Ext. 2777
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Becker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Becker ( CPSO# 72197 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carlton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-7878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2003