Beckford, Claudine Gerrilyn (CPSO#: 95705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: James, Claudine Gerrilyn (used until: 13 Sep 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Martha Street, Suite 102
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1
Phone: 9058572344
Fax: 855-386-2608
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

106 Victoria Street W
Alliston ON  L9R1L7
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

5988 8th Line, Beeton, ON
Beeton ON  L0G1A0
Canada
Phone: (905) 729-2267
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Beckford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Beckford ( CPSO# 95705 )

Business Address:
106 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1L7

Business Address:
Suite 102
30 Martha Street
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1

Business Address:
5988 8th Line
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 729-2267

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDINE GERRILYN BECKFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015