Bedard, Michael John-Lloyd (CPSO#: 62262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Spragge Street
Manitowaning ON  P0P 1N0
Phone: (705) 859-2170
Fax: (705) 859-2212
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bedard ( CPSO# 62262 )

Business Address:
23 Spragge Street
Manitowaning ON  P0P 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 859-2170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN-LLOYD BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1992