Bedford, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 32558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
329 March Road
Suite 224
Kanata ON  K2K 2E1
Phone: (613) 592-3126
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bedford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bedford ( CPSO# 32558 )

Business Address:
224 - 329 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2E1
Phone Number: (613) 592-3126

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL BEDFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1981