Beecker, Jennifer Ruth (CPSO#: 73515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 523-4921
Fax: (613) 523-5339
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Dermatology
The Ottawa Hospital Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Avenue
4th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Beecker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beecker ( CPSO# 73515 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 523-4921

Business Address:
Division of Dermatology
The Ottawa Hospital Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER RUTH BEECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001