Beecroft, James Michael (CPSO#: 84263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James M. Beecroft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beecroft ( CPSO# 84263 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL BEECROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECROFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008