Beecroft, John Robert Douglas (CPSO#: 79769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 563
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2566
Fax: (416) 586-8695
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Rob Beecroft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beecroft ( CPSO# 79769 )

Business Address:
Department Of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 563
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
NCSB 1C
Suite 546
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 256
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Suite 918
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT DOUGLAS BEECROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEECROFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003