Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Beland, Renee Loretta (CPSO#: 63868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 837-2283
Fax: (519) 767-2262
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Chung and Dr. Renee Beland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beland ( CPSO# 63868 )
Dr. E. Chung ( CPSO# 65458 )

Business Address:
208 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2283

Business Address:
103 - 73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 873-1401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE LORETTA BELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992