Bell, Thomas Albert Botly (CPSO#: 50134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
165 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3S4
Phone: (416) 961-9828
Fax: (416) 961-5553
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas A.B. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2008


Corporation Name: Thomas A.B. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2010


Corporation Name: Thomas A.B. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ALBERT BOTLY BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)