Bellefeuille, Julie (CPSO#: 65649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M2
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Bellefeuille Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bellefeuille ( CPSO# 65649 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE BELLEFEUILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLEFEUILLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993