Bellinaso, John Leonard (CPSO#: 67058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
PO Box 1018
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Bellinaso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bellinaso ( CPSO# 67058 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
PO Box 1018
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LEONARD BELLINASO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLINASO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1998