Ben Musa, Sirajeddin Awad Abdulmatloub (CPSO#: 84084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
225 - 955 Queen St E
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 450-0100
Fax: (705) 450-0102
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1275 Walker rd
suite # 7
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-4511
Fax: (519) 254-7226
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sirajeddin Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ben Musa ( CPSO# 84084 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Suite 225
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 450-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIRAJEDDIN AWAD ABDULMATLOUB BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2006 to 11 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010