Ben Omran, Karima (CPSO#: 71893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5
Phone: (905) 453-5789
Fax: (888) 248-1241
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Omran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ben Omran ( CPSO# 71893 )

Business Address:
207 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5
Phone Number: (905) 453-5789

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIMA BEN OMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN OMRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 18 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)