Bence-Bruckler, Isabelle Andri (CPSO#: 60927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Haematology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 739-6021
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Isabelle Bence-Bruckler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bence-Bruckler ( CPSO# 60927 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISABELLE ANDRI BENCE-BRUCKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENCE-BRUCKLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1990