Benedek, Linda Joyce (CPSO#: 64251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2238
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen M. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. L. Benedek ( CPSO# 64251 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA JOYCE BENEDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENEDEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1998