Benson, Leland Nathan (CPSO#: 53449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Finch University of Health Sciences, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network - TGH
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street,
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LELAND NATHAN BENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1983