Bentley, Todd Christopher (CPSO#: 73472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Advanced Physiotherapy and
Sports Medicine Clinic
550 Fennell Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8V 4S9
Phone: (905) 304-7950
Fax: (905) 304-0673
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bentley & Dr. Caron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Caron ( CPSO# 73556 )
Dr. T. Bentley ( CPSO# 73472 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L9L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
Holbrook Building Out-Pt Dept
Sanitorium Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 1C4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD CHRISTOPHER BENTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENTLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004