Berg, Gregory Mark Alexander (CPSO#: 57385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Floor - Superior Place
264 McNabb St.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y6
Phone: (705) 254-5980
Fax: (705) 254-6969
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Berg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Berg ( CPSO# 57385 )

Business Address:
Superior Place
First Floor
264 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y6
Phone Number: (705) 254-5980

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospitals,Thessalon Site Thessalon
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MARK ALEXANDER BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987