Berlingieri, Joseph Carmen (CPSO#: 62421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 331-3101
Fax: (905) 319-2499
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Berlingieri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Berlingieri ( CPSO# 62421 )

Business Address:
JBMH
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
301 - 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 331-3960

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH CARMEN BERLINGIERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLINGIERI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991