Bernardini, Marcus Quirino (CPSO#: 73845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital/UHN
Dept of Gynecology Oncology
700 University Avenue Suite 6-812
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4043
Fax: (416) 946-2288
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Bernardini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bernardini ( CPSO# 73845 )

Business Address:
Department of Gynecology Oncology
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 6-812
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS QUIRINO BERNARDINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARDINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005