Bernhard, Nirit (CPSO#: 79013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Room 7726
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-7841
Fax: 416-813-5663
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Team
77 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernhard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bernhard ( CPSO# 79013 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Paediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Room 7726
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
3rd Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIRIT BERNHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNHARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2006 to 15 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2007