Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bernstein, Steven Charles (CPSO#: 64441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Health Care Center
Suite 213
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 936-1814
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven C. Bernstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bernstein ( CPSO# 64441 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Health Care Centre
213 - 820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone Number: (613) 936-1814

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN CHARLES BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991