Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bertlik, Maria (CPSO#: 57945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:University of Palacky, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6576
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bertlik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertlik ( CPSO# 57945 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA BERTLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTLIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1994