Bertoia, John Thomas Douglas (CPSO#: 54173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive
Suite 300
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 895-1361
Fax: (905) 895-0561
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Thomas Bertoia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertoia ( CPSO# 54173 )

Business Address:
300 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1361

Business Address:
South Lake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS DOUGLAS BERTOIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTOIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1985