Bertucci, Marco Antonio (CPSO#: 74019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone: (705) 362-4291
Fax: (705) 372-2923
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 303
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-1777
Fax: (647) 436-7754
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Yanivker & M. Bertucci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertucci ( CPSO# 74019 )
Dr. S. Yanivker ( CPSO# 75194 )

Business Address:
Notre Dame Hospital
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Critical Care Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
303 - 2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 926-1777

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCO ANTONIO BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 12 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005