Besemann, Markus Heinrich (CPSO#: 59545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services HQ
1745 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K6
Phone: (613) 945-6600 Ext. 6515
Fax: (613) 998-3924
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Capital Vocational Specialists
2781 Lancaster Road
Suite 304
Ottawa ON  K1B 1A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 736-9117
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKUS HEINRICH BESEMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESEMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989