Best, Timothy John (CPSO#: 59419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
421 Bay Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 1X3
Phone: (705) 256-6012
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy J. Best Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Best ( CPSO# 59419 )

Business Address:
504 - 421 Bay Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 256-6012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN BEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997