Bested, Alison Christine (CPSO#: 50147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nova Southeastern University
Center for Collaborative Research
3321 College Ave Suite 405
Davie FL  33314
United States
Phone: 945 262-2866
Fax: 945 262-3850
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bested Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 12 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON CHRISTINE BESTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESTED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1984