Bevan, David Richard (CPSO#: 75688)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cambridge, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Bevan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Apr 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2013