Beveridge, Robert Campbell (CPSO#: 51405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 498-0365
Fax: (613) 498-1479
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert C. Beveridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beveridge ( CPSO# 51405 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 498-0365

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CAMPBELL BEVERIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEVERIDGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1983