Bhandari, Mohit (CPSO#: 68023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellington Medical Co Op
Suite 110
293 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone: 9055416057
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhandari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhandari ( CPSO# 68023 )

Business Address:
293 Wellington Street North
Suite 110
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone Number: (905) 541-6057

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHIT BHANDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANDARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002