Bhatt, Nikhil Roy (CPSO#: 85440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 King Street West
Prescott ON  K0E 1T0
Phone: (613) 925-5977
Fax: (613) 925-1238
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Charles St
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 6133455645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikhil Bhatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bhatt ( CPSO# 85440 )

Business Address:
555 King Street West
Prescott ON  K0E 1T0
Phone Number: (613) 925-5977

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKHIL ROY BHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 25 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007