Bhattacharjee, Rakesh (CPSO#: 77647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
586 Eglinton Ave East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 488-6980
Fax: (416) 488-3998
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3020 Children's Way
MC 5070
San Diego CA  60637-1470
United States
Phone: 8589665846
Fax: 8585699052
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH BHATTACHARJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATTACHARJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009