Bielecki, Barbara Ania (CPSO#: 86344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Names: Bielecki, Barbara Ania Kuziora (used until: 28 Jan 2015 )     Kuziora, Barbara Ania (used until: 17 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
15 Mountain Ave South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 662-4911
Fax: (905) 662-1688
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Bielecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bielecki ( CPSO# 86344 )

Business Address:
311 - 15 Mountain Avenue
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 662-4911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANIA BIELECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009