Bilibajkich, Juliana (CPSO#: 68022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oasis Medical Centre
Unit 140
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0B8
Phone: (519) 727-3335
Fax: (519) 727-6288
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juliana Bilibajkich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2003

Dr. J. Bilibajkich ( CPSO# 68022 )

Business Address:
Unit 140
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 727-0100


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JULIANA BILIBAJKICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILIBAJKICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996