Biman, Birubi Rani (CPSO#: 65068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 345-4500
Fax: (807) 345-4501
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Biman & Telang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Telang ( CPSO# 65113 )
Dr. B. Biman ( CPSO# 65068 )

Business Address:
303 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 345-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 30 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIRUBI RANI BIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993