Bindlish, Vinita (CPSO#: 68889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
558 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E3
Phone: (519) 576-2200
Fax: (519) 576-5675
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Bindlish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bindlish ( CPSO# 68889 )

Business Address:
558 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E3
Phone Number: (519) 576-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINITA BINDLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINDLISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000