Binnie, William Matthew Heath (CPSO#: 70183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 11PMB133
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4019
Fax: (416) 340-3609
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hospital
Room 6-044
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5811
Fax: (416) 864-5650
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Binnie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Binnie ( CPSO# 70183 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
6-042 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5406

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 11PMB133
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3235

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MATTHEW HEATH BINNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINNIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000